U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00247
  • Case Name: NEWREZ LLC v. CAMPO
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.