U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00371
  • Case Name: COUNTY OF KNOX et al v. PURDUE PHARMA LP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [MDL Certified Transfer Order]
  • September 20, 2019: [MDL Conditional Transfer Order]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order of Recusal]
  • August 15, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.