U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00249
  • Case Name: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF11 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. MANETTI et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.