U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00340
  • Case Name: KORTLEVEN v. HANNAFORD BROS CO LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Order]
  • August 15, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.