U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00291
  • Case Name: HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE IN TRUST FOR THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF ACE SECURITIES CORP HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST SERIES 2006-NC3 ASSET BACKED PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES v. LOMBARDO
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.