U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00187
  • Case Name: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF THE CWABS INC ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-17 v. YARDLEY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Order]
  • November 18, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.