U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00346
  • Case Name: HARRIS v. LIBERTY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Service]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.