U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00239
  • Case Name: CLEAN-O-RAMA INC v. COMMERCIAL DEPARTMENT CONTAINERS CDC CANADA INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.