U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00420
  • Case Name: KRISTIANSEN v. TOWN OF KITTERY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Report of Conference of Counsel and Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Confidentiality Order]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.