U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00318
  • Case Name: BARTON et al v. VILLAGE MORTGAGE COMPANY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Judgment - Default]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Order]
  • September 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Writ Issued]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attachment & Trustee Process]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.