U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00341
  • Case Name: DOE v. REGIONAL SCHOOL UNIT NO 21 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Order]
  • January 25, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order of Recusal]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.