U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00290
  • Case Name: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. LEAVITT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Judgment of Foreclosure]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Order for Service]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.