U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00260
  • Case Name: DOCAMPO v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.