U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00158
  • Case Name: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON v. GILBERT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.