U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00155
  • Case Name: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE FOR TRUMAN 2016 SC6 TITLE TRUST v. KEEFER et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Order]
  • July 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.