U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00171
  • Case Name: FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION v. MAINE REVENUE SERVICES et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Order]
  • April 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.