U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10485
  • Case Name: Suzette L Randall
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Continue Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Matrix]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Order to Comply]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.