U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10483
  • Case Name: Anita J Lambert
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.