U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20472
  • Case Name: Anesha Latifah Floyd
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Withdraw Document]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order on Document]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Sua Sponte Order]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Dismissing Case]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Emergency Hearing]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Reply]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Objection]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Emergency Hearing]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Compel]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order to Comply]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.