U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20470
  • Case Name: Lynn L. Forrest
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow Claims]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow Claims]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • November 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.