U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20463
  • Case Name: Dawn Lyn Davis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Dismissing Case]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • August 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Order to Comply]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.