U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10470
  • Case Name: Gregory O'Halloran
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • January 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Response]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Document]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Show Cause]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Show Cause]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order on Document]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Order on Document]
  • November 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Supplemental Transmittal of Record on Appeal]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Supplemental Transmittal of Record on Appeal]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Transcript]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Transcript]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • November 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Converting Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Convert Case 13 to 07]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Acknowledgement of Request for Transcript of Testimony]
  • November 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Transmittal of Record on Appeal]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • October 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Appellant Designation]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Supplemental Appeal Transmission Form]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Appellee Statement of Election]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [For Change of Venue]
  • October 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Appeal Transmission Form]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
September, 2018
  • September 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Generic Motion]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Generic Motion]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • August 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.