U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 13-10273
  • Case Name: Nichole Lynn Davis Dube and Edmond Joseph Dube, III
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Approving Final Report & Account]
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Distribution]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Compromise Controversy]
August, 2018
  • August 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Compromise Controversy]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.