U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10468
  • Case Name: Maria Elana Johnson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Discharging Debtor]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Financial Management Course]
  • December 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Reopen Chapter 07 Case]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reopen Chapter 07 Case]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Entry]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reopen Chapter 07 Case]
  • November 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [9013-1(d) Deficiency Order]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reopen Chapter 07 Case]
  • November 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case Without Discharge]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.