U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10467
  • Case Name: Terrence William Marks and Tina Jean Marks
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • December 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Extend Time]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.