U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10459
  • Case Name: Dale R Orr and Irene J Orr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • August 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.