U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10457
  • Case Name: Miranda Anne Merchant
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Response]
May, 2019
  • May 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf - interested parties only)]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf - interested parties only)]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Sanctions]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Sanctions]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Contempt]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Contempt]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf - interested parties only)]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf - interested parties only)]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Generic Motion]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Generic Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order on Document]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Order on Document]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order on Document]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Order on Document]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Affidavit]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Affidavit]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharging Debtor]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Contempt]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Contempt]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Objection]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Receipt of Installment Payment Final]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Receipt of Installment Payment Final]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Supplemental Document]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Supplemental Document]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Withdraw Document]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf - interested parties only)]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf - interested parties only)]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Declaration]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Declaration]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Objection]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Receipt of Installment Payment #3]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #3]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Fees Due]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Entry]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reconsider]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reconsider]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Request for Change of Address]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Request for Change of Address]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Order on Document]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Supplemental Document]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #2]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Response]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Generic Motion]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Contempt]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Schedules and Statements]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Statement of Intent]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Request for Change of Address]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Proposed Order]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Generic Motion]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • August 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Hearing Set]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Emergency Hearing]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Generic Motion]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Fees Due]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Converting Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Statement About Payment of Eviction Judgment (Form 101B)]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Statement About Payment of Eviction Judgment (Form 101B)]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Schedules and Statements]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • August 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Exhibit]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Matrix]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Order to Comply]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Initial Statement of Eviction Judgment (Form 101A)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.