U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 12-20993
  • Case Name: Donald Bernier and Pauline C. Bernier
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2018
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Discharging Debtor]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Discharge]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Request for Discharge]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Reopen Chapter 11 Case]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Reopen Chapter 11 Case]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Change of Address]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.