U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10454
  • Case Name: Matthew R Mackenzie and Lisa M Mackenzie
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • August 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
May, 2019
  • May 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow Claims]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow Claims]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Show Cause]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
November, 2018
  • November 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • November 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • November 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • November 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Document]
  • November 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • November 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order on Objection to Claim of Exempt Property]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Application for Redaction of Personal Identifiers (Fee Per Case)]
  • October 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order on Document]
  • October 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • August 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.