U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20439
  • Case Name: Clinton W. Steward and Betty G. Steward
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Withdrawal as Attorney]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • November 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Relief from Stay]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Relief from Stay]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.