U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10449
  • Case Name: Chad T Januskiewicz and Rhonda G Januskiewicz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • December 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
November, 2018
  • November 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Extend Time]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Proposed Order]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Entry]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Extend Time]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.