U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02012
  • Case Name: Piampiano v. Gendreau et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Entry]
March, 2019
  • March 23, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order on Document]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Document]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 10, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 06, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.