U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20436
  • Case Name: Michael J. Carrier
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf - interested parties only)]
  • October 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Order of Ineffective Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Reaffirmation Agreement Cover Sheet]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.