U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20434
  • Case Name: Robert G. Cardona and Stacey T. Cardona
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
March, 2019
  • March 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order Regarding Withdrawal of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Application for Redaction of Personal Identifiers (Fee Per Case)]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • November 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Operating Report]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.