U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10445
  • Case Name: Harmon Tire, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Memorandum]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • October 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Consent]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • September 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Supplemental Document]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Entry]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • August 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedules and Statements]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Change of Address]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order to Comply]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Joint Administration]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.