U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10446
  • Case Name: Milton Albert Harmon, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • September 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Change of Address]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Scheduling Order]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • August 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Entry]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Tax Documents]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.