U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10438
  • Case Name: Nancy Moxley Guay and Stewart C Guay
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Compensation]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Compensation]
March, 2019
  • March 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Employ]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Employ]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amend Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Motion]
  • December 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Sell]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Employ]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Sell]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Document]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • October 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Sell]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Generic Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • September 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Generic Motion]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Employ]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Employ]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Change of Address]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.