U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10439
  • Case Name: Kenneth C Burns and Melissa A Burns
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Transfer of Claim]
April, 2019
  • April 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow Claims]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow Claims]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Certificate of Service]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.