U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10440
  • Case Name: Lois A. Gonya
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Dismiss Case]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Entry]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Dismiss Case]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Repeat Filer]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.