U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02011
  • Case Name: Piampiano v. American Express Company
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • January 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 26, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 30, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Document]
  • August 30, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.