U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20422
  • Case Name: Patricia Ann Powers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Change of Address]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Relief from Stay]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing Set]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Proposed Order]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing Set]
  • October 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Entry]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [9013-1(d) Deficiency Order]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Relief from Stay]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.