U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20420
  • Case Name: Jodi-Marie Flynn
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Extend Time]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • October 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [9013-1(d) Deficiency Order]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Consent]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Extend Time]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.