U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10424
  • Case Name: Robert Arthur Davis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
September, 2018
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Application for Redaction of Personal Identifiers (Fee Per Case)]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Relief from Stay Consented]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.