U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10423
  • Case Name: Jeffrey M. Polky and Amy L. Polky
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allowing and Disallowing Claims]
  • January 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 12 Plan]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 12 Confirmation]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Supplemental Document]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Document]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.