U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20401
  • Case Name: Bonnie Lee Therrien
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • December 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
  • October 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Employ]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.