U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20399
  • Case Name: Charles Scott Mollica, Sr. and Norma Raquel Mollica
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Dismissing Case]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
  • July 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Entry]
  • July 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Hearing Set]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Amended Order]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Show Cause]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.