U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10412
  • Case Name: Ecoshel, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw Document]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • February 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • February 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • January 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Application]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Application]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • December 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Pre-Trial Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Change of Address]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Sua Sponte Order]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Entry]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Equity Security Holders]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule H]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule G]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule E/F]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule D]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule A/B]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order to Comply]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.