U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20394
  • Case Name: Justin Derick Dobson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
July, 2018
  • July 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Dismissing Case]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Order to Comply]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.