U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10404
  • Case Name: Patrick A. Gregory and Kristie L. Gregory
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Approving Report on Conversion]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Extend Time]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Extend Time]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Proposed Order]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Converting Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow Claims]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow Claims]
December, 2018
  • December 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • November 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
September, 2018
  • September 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.