U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-01009
  • Case Name: Maine Savings Federal Credit Union v. Oxley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
October, 2018
  • October 27, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 25, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • October 25, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Set]
  • September 10, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Amended Certificate of Service]
  • September 10, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic Motion ]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Entry]
  • August 15, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Document]
  • August 06, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.